If you find an error in the data or would like to suggest changes, contact us.
Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Philip A. Altavilla
Status: Permanently removed from ministry
Appeared under the heading: “List Of Individuals For Whom Allegations Of Sexual Abuse Of A Minor Have Been Admitted, Established Or Determined To Be Credible - Diocesan Clergy”
Birth Year: 1966
Ordination year: 1992
Reported assignment history:
- Saint Mary of Mount Carmel, Dunmore, PA, 7/7/1992
- Holy Trinity, Nanticoke, PA 6/30/1995
- Diocesan Director of Ecumenism and Inter-faith Affairs, 7/8/1996
- Saint Patrick, Holy Cross, Saint John the Baptist and Immaculate Heart of Mary Chapel, Scranton, 7/8/1996
- Immaculate Conception Taylor (Administrator), 3/27/2000
- Immaculate Conception and Saint John the Baptist, Taylor, (Pastor), 7/5/2000
- Presbyteral Council, 6/30/2002
- (three-year appointment) Saint Thomas More, Lake Ariel, 11/10/2004
- to 7/10/2007
- Episcopal Vicar for the Northern Pastoral Region of the Diocese, 7/10/2007
- Our Lady of the Snows, Clarks Summit, (in residence), 7/10/2007
- Holy Cross Regional High School System, (Board of Directors), 11/2/2007
- Nativity, Scranton, 2/20/2008
- Holy Cross High School, Dunmore (Chaplain), 7/15/2009
- to 9/22/2009
- Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary and Saint John the Evangelist, Scranton, 9/4/2009
- Scouts of America in the Diocese of Scranton, (Chaplain), 7/13/2010
- Immaculate Conception, Scranton, 7/6/2010
- to 11/18/2010
- Saint Peter's Cathedral, Scranton, 7/11/2011
If you find an error in the data or would like to suggest changes, contact us.