This database was last updated in October 2019 and should only be used as a historical snapshot. There may be new information that is not included here.
Staffers with Resumes
After discovering that the resumes of political appointees include information not revealed on their financial disclosure forms, Property of the People used data from Trump Town and Freedom of Information Act requests to obtain as many staff resumes as possible.
Jamieson Greer
U.S. Trade Representative (joined: May 12, 2017)
Chief of Staff | $179,700 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- Kirkland & Ellis LLP Of Counsel
- Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP Associate
Former Compensation Sources
- Kirkland & Ellis LLP legal services
- Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP legal services
Garrison Griffin departed May 13, 2017
U.S. Trade Representative (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Special Assistant to the U.S. Trade Representative | $60,470 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Nancy A. Guiden departed Sept. 16, 2017
Small Business Administration (joined: May 28, 2017)
Director of Faith Based and Community Initiatives, Office of Faith Based and Community Initiatives | $131,767 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Donald Lawrence Gutman
Agriculture (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Senior Advisor to the Chief Financial Officer | $126,148-$189,600 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via LinkedIn:
Partner - Aronson LLC, 2010 - 2014 - Retired Served as Partner and Director of Quality Control for Aronson LLC which is listed as one of INSIDE Public Accounting's top 100 national accounting firms. Responsible for all aspects of the firm's quality and compliance functions for the Audit Department. Assure delivery of quality professional services and compliance with all external regulatory requirements, including AICPA, PCAOB, DOL, and SEC. Areas of expertise include: government contracting, construction, real estate, high technology, not-for-profit and employee benefit plans. Partner - Ernst & Young LLP, 1979 - 2007 - Retired. Thirty years' experience in public accounting with increasing management and technical responsibility. Performed as the lead coordinating audit partner for a varied list of public and private clients with a primary focus on REITs, construction, real estate, hospitality, homebuilding, governmental institutions and service firms.
Former Positions Outside Government
- The Children's Inn at NIH Advisory Member - Audit Committee
Heath Hall departed Feb. 11, 2018
Transportation (joined: June 23, 2017)
Deputy Administrator | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Compensation Sources
- Committee to Elect Ashby Foote Political Consultation
- Committee to Elect John Brady Political Consultation
- Friends of Joel Bomgar Political Consultation
- Judge Laurie White Political Consultation
- KDL Solutions, LLC Public Relations Consultation
- Kelly Williams Political Consultation
- Lane Reed Political Consultation
- Madison County Board of Supervisors Public Relations Consultation
- Madison County Mississippi Public Relations Consultation
- Michael Pantin Political Consultation
- Office of the District Attorney Public Relations Consultation
- Office of the Sheriff Public Relations Consultation
- Strategic Marketing Group Consulting Business - Political and Public Relations
Julia Zsuzsa Haller
Housing and Urban Development (joined: Aug. 14, 2017)
Senior Advisor | $112,021 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- Law Offices of Juli Z. Haller Proprietor
Former Compensation Sources
- Atlantic Service Group, Inc. (ASG) Legal Representation of ASG (public record) .
- Broadspire Legal Representation of Insurance Co. Broad spire and of its Insured Acme - Invoiced
- Charles Woolridge Legal Representation (representation is a m atter of Public record)
- Christopher Whitehouse Legal Representation of Christopher Whiteho use (public record).
- Hill Strategy LLC and IEX Investor's Exchange (NY) Legal representation/ advice.
- Law Offices of David C. Numrych, PC // Regency Cab Co-Representation of Regency Cab Co., a VA registered business. (Matter of Public Reco rd)
- Look Restaurant/ Cities Restaurant/ TGR Inc. Legal Representation of Look Restaurant Bar & Grill AKA Cities / TGR, Inc. (Matter of public record).
- Mark Kaufman Legal Representation of his Company, Hastin gs Development Corp. (now based in Silver S pring MD), (matter of public record).
- Pilar Hospitality Group, LLC Legal Representation of Bar Pilar aka Pilar Hospitality Group, LLC (public record).
- Republican Party of Virgnia Campaign work
- Warren C. McDowell Legal Representation (matter of public reco rd)
Casey B. Hammond
Interior (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Special Assistant to the Secretary | Chief of Staff | $131,767 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Austin Rex Harris departed March 4, 2017
Agriculture (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Staff Assistant | Staff Assistant, Food, Nutrition and Consumer Services | $42,823 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via Daily Iowegian:
Harris grew up on a family farm southwest of Moulton [Iowa]. He recently [2014] graduated second in his class at Moulton-Udell High School and is a current student at Indian Hills Community College in Ottumwa. Harris previously worked on the Larry Sheets for Iowa House campaign in 2012 and as a field director on the Miller-Meeks for Congress campaign in 2014.
Brandye Lyn Hendrickson
Transportation (joined: July 24, 2017)
Deputy Administrator | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Compensation Sources
- State of Indiana Commissioner, Indiana Dept. of Transportation Director, Indiana State Personnel Department
Tina-Maria G. Henry departed Aug. 4, 2017
Commerce (joined: April 11, 2017)
Director of Scheduling, Office of the Chief of Staff | $149,337 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- The Heritage Foundation Scheduler/Assistant
- The Hudson Institute Scheduler/Assistant
Martha DeLynn Henry departed Oct. 6, 2017
Transportation (joined: Jan. 30, 2017)
Special Assistant for Scheduling | Executive Assistant to the Secretary | $161,900 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Elizabeth Hill
Education (joined: April 23, 2017)
Special Assistant | Press Secretary | $112,101 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via Department of Education via Internet Archive:
Prior to joining the Department, Hill served as communications director for U.S. Rep. Jeb Hensarling (R-TX), chairman of the House Financial Services Committee, between 2016-2017, and as communications director to U.S. Rep. Luke Messer (R-IN), chairman of the House Republican Policy Committee, between 2013-2016. A former television news reporter and morning news anchor from 2005-2013, Hill has a B.A. in communications from Brigham Young University and a master's in strategic public relations from The George Washington University.
Donald Bruce Hoffman
Federal Trade Commission (joined: July 8, 2017)
Special Advisor to the Chairman | Director, Bureau of Competition | $161,900 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Daniel Cayetano Bucheli Holguin
Office of National Drug Control Policy
Public Affairs Specialist (Press Secretary) | Resume »
Scott C. Hommel
Interior (joined: Jan. 27, 2017)
Special Assistant to the Secretary | Chief Of Staff, Secretarys Immediate Office | $170,000 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- PAL S.L.G. LLC Member
Lobbied for
- American Defense Systems, Inc.
- CYBERLUX CORPORATION
- Impact Instrumentation
- RG Medical Diagnostics, Development of GeraTherm warming blanket and other medical diagnostic devices.
- SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION
Dudley Hoskins
Agriculture (joined: Oct. 4, 2017)
Chief of Staff, Office of the Under Secretary for Marketing and Regulatory Programs | Resume »
Lobbied for
Samira I. Howard
U.S. International Trade Commission (joined: July 23, 2017)
Confidential Assistant, Office of the Commissioner | $66,510 | Resume »
Steven Howke
Senior Advisor | $131,767 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- Millennium Corporate Credit Union Senior Finanacial Analyst/Business Development
- TreasureState CorporateCredit Union President/CEO
- Whitefish Credit Union CFO
Bethany Blair Hudson departed Jan. 6, 2018
Agriculture (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Confidential Assistant | Confidential Assistant, Marketing and Regulatory Programs | $66,510 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via Beafort County Now via Internet Archive:
Bethany Hudson, the newly hired Director of Coalitions, was born in Pittsboro, North Carolina. She attended the UNC-Wilmington where she was heavily involved in College Republicans, both at the university level, and through the North Carolina Federation of College Republicans. She worked for Americans for Prosperity as a Regional Field Coordinator in the Wilmington area during the 2012 election cycle. In early 2013, Bethany took a job as a legislative assistant for Representative Bob Steinburg in the North Carolina House. In 2014 she was elected and served as the president of the Wake County Republican Women's Club. Simultaneously, she served as a vice president of the North Carolina Federation of Young Republicans.
Former Positions Outside Government
- North Carolina General Assembly Legislative Assistant
Former Compensation Sources
Gregory Alan Ibach
Agriculture (joined: Oct. 26, 2017)
Under Secretary for Marketing and Regulatory Programs | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- Family Trust Trustee (I do not receive any compensation for my services as Trustee of this family trust.)
- GTI INC. President
- National Association of State Departments of Agriculture (NASDA) President
- National Association of State Departments of Agriculture (NASDA) Past President (The position of Past President is an officer position on the NASDA Board of Directors.)
- State of Nebraska Director of Agriculture
Former Compensation Sources
- GTI INC. Management services as the joint owner of this cow, calf, corn and soybean farming operation.
- State of Nebraska Serve as Director of Agriculture for the State of Nebraska. In that capacity, I oversee the Department of Agriculture, whose mission is to regulate industries, as prescribed by statute, and to encourage and promote the interests of agriculture through advocacy and education.
James Todd Inman
Transportation (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Director of Operations | $161,900 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Former Positions Outside Government
- Riverpark Center for Performing Arts Board of Directors
- State Farm Agent
- Wendell Foster Campus For Developmental Disabilities Chairman of the Board
Former Compensation Sources
Christopher L. Jackson departed April 26, 2019
U.S. Trade Representative (joined: May 1, 2017)
Assistant U.S. Trade Representative for Congressional Affairs | $131,767 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Kevin Alan Jayne
Energy (joined: June 19, 2017)
Special Advisor, Assistant Secretary for Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy | $93,008 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via Department of Energy:
Kevin Jayne is serving as Special Advisor to the Assistant Secretary in the Office of Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy (EERE). In his current role, he provides support and counsel to the Assistant Secretary. His background includes nearly 10 years of experience in the energy industry with a focus on natural gas delivery. He worked on the upgrades and protection of about 4,300 miles of natural gas infrastructure in Chicago, the third largest city in the nation. Using his command of pipeline technologies, he concentrated on the integrity of critical facilities. Most recently, he was detailed as a Presidential Appointee with the United States Department of Agriculture (USDA). He performed as a Confidential Assistant for the Undersecretary of Food, Nutrition and Consumer Services, responsible for the most sizable portion of USDA’s budget. He served on the 58th Presidential Inaugural Committee. Additionally, Kevin won election as a delegate in Illinois’ 4th Congressional District. He further represented the District by casting his vote at a United States presidential nominating convention.
Former Positions Outside Government
- People's Gas Light and Coke (WEC) Utility Worker
Former Compensation Sources
- People's Gas Light and Coke (WEC) Utility worker
Virginia H. Johnson departed July 17, 2017
Interior (joined: Jan. 20, 2017)
Special Assistant to the Secretary | Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary For Fish and Wildlife and Parks | $161,900 | Financial disclosure not required to be publicly released for this position | Resume »
Virginia Johnson was director of federal relations for North Carolina Gov. Pat McCrory, a staffer in the House, a legislative affairs advisor for the Department of Defense and a lobbyist for Red Cross. — ProPublica
Lobbied for
Joshua James Jones
Energy (joined: May 15, 2017)
Senior Advisor for Special Projects | $131,767 | Financial Disclosure » | Resume »
Bio, via Houston Chronicle:
Texas state director for Trump campaign
Former Positions Outside Government
- Jjones Consulting, Inc. Owner (This consulting company is dormant and does not have any clients.)
Former Compensation Sources
- Donald J. Trump for President State Director of Texas Campaign
- Matt Murphy for Houston Campaign Manager for City Councilor candidate